KENTISBEARE SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organisation of fundraising events to raise additional money for Kentisbeare Primary School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Devon
Governance
- 18 June 1996: Standard registration
- KSA (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Elaine Bliss-Howe | Chair | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Beth Philpot | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
ASHLEY WALTER PERSEY | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Andrew William Chave | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kayleigh Chave | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexis Ephgrave | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Lacey | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Jane Kissock | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kirsten Fiona Cantrill | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Josephine Hawkins | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Reed | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Collier | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Stidworthy | Trustee | 21 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Frier | Trustee | 29 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.09k | £4.48k | £9.55k | £11.42k | £11.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.06k | £7.97k | £4.05k | £13.52k | £11.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 24 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 08 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 JUNE 1982 AND AMENDED 21 MAY 1996
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mortimers Farm
Blackborough
CULLOMPTON
Devon
EX15 2HW
- Phone:
- 07775713628
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window