Accounts and annual returns CORBET FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1056272
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 20 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 20 March 2022 263 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 26 October 2021 483 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 31 October 2018 123 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required