Financial history CORBET FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1056272
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £4.40k £3.47k £1.38k £2.16k £0
Total expenditure £3.61k £534 £73 £749 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A