HUMPTY DUMPTY'S EASTON PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1056309
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 10 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 10 June 2020 On time
Annual return 31 August 2018 01 July 2019 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 01 July 2019 1 days late
Annual return 31 August 2017 26 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 29 June 2018 On time
Annual return 31 August 2016 27 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 29 June 2017 On time