KINGSTON CHILDMINDING ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(A) To promote the provision of facilities for the daily care, recreation and education of children under the age of 5 years and to promote the observance of good standards of childminding by the parents of such children and all persons and organisations providing such facilities. (B) To advance the education and training of childminders and other persons and organisations providing daycare facili
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kingston Upon Thames
Governance
- 24 June 1996: Standard registration
- K C M A (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KATE BURDEN | Chair | 25 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
MONICA WURZ | Trustee | 24 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA TYLER | Trustee | 25 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
ERIN MCGUIGAN | Trustee | 06 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
GAIL BENNETT | Trustee | 06 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
KIM BYRNE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.28k | £28.06k | £19.14k | £19.38k | £11.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.76k | £30.00k | £18.16k | £20.79k | £20.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £17.00k | £17.00k | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 823 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 823 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1188 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1188 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1553 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1553 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23RD APRIL 1996
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE DAILY CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER THE AGE OF 5 YEARS AND PROMOTE THE OBSERVANCE OF GOOD STANDARDS OF CHILDMINDING BY THE PARENTS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND ALL PERSONS AND ORGANSIATIONS PROVIDING SUCH FACILITIES (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF CHILDMINDERS AND OTHER PERSONS AND ORGANISATIONS PROVIDING DAY CARE FACILITIES FOR CHILDREN UNDER THE AGE OF 5 YEARS TO CONDUCT RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS OF THE CARE, RECREATION AND EUCATION OF SUCH CHILDREN, AND PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH
Area of benefit
ROYAL LONDON BOROUGH OF KINGSTIN-UPON-THAMES
Contact information
- Address:
-
United Reformed Church
Richard Mayo Centre
Eden Street
Kingston upon Thames
KT1 1HZ
- Phone:
- 02085466308
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window