Trustees DARTMOOR TRUST

Charity number: 1056362
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LT COL ANTHONY HUMPHREYS CLARK Chair 12 January 2012
None on record
Joanna Louise Burgess Trustee 25 January 2021
None on record
Charlotte Catto Trustee 16 September 2019
None on record
Andrew Cooper Trustee 12 September 2017
TORBAY MUSEUMS TRUST
Received: On time
Richard Wraith Trustee 21 November 2016
None on record
ALLISON GIBSON Trustee 01 July 2016
None on record
TIMOTHY JOHN PETER EMERSON Trustee 01 July 2016
THE BRYAN FOSTER CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
SUSAN JANE EBERLE Trustee 12 January 2012
None on record
SIMON MARCUS BUTLER Trustee
None on record