Accounts and annual returns PARENT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION OF THE AMERICAN SCHOOL IN LONDON

Charity number: 1056386
Charity reporting is up to date (26 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2022 26 May 2023 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 26 May 2023 26 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 28 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 12 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 12 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 25 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 25 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 11 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 22 March 2019 On time Download Open in new window