Financial history PARENT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION OF THE AMERICAN SCHOOL IN LONDON

Charity number: 1056386
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £951.83k £82.34k £58.84k £188.62k £20.60k
Total expenditure £916.58k £154.58k £113.73k £75.61k £43.31k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £901.88k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £48.37k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £1.58k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £702.28k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £214.30k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £8.73k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A