TAMAR EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 1056466
Charity reporting is up to date (264 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 July 2021 264 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 21 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 21 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 25 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 25 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 03 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 03 May 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2015 29 February 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2015 Not Required