TAMAR EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 1056466
Charity reporting is up to date (264 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2015 31/07/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £100 £76.97k £77.95k £103.63k £24.95k
Total expenditure £10.56k £37.84k £47.23k £27.69k £21.87k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A