Financial history IRSHAD TRUST

Charity number: 1056468
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £931.05k £961.72k £1.04m £981.37k £1.11m
Total expenditure £1.03m £1.03m £986.61k £928.54k £1.05m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £71.13k £135.62k
Income - Donations and legacies £734.09k £666.35k £200.21k £108.75k £100.01k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £183.43k £295.37k £842.38k £801.49k £870.28k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £13.53k £0 £0 £71.13k £135.62k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.03m £1.03m £986.61k £928.54k £1.05m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £62.22k £0 £18.02k £0 £21.94k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0