PostScript 360 Limited

Charity number: 1056508
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £58.35k £58.23k £27.21k £16.08k £17.13k
Total expenditure £112.91k £107.31k £101.92k £103.29k £130.48k
Income from government contracts £53.73k £58.07k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A