THOMAS JOHNSON LOWER SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising to provide additional educational and recreational facilities to the pupils of Thomas Johnson Lower School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 02 July 1996: Standard registration
- THOMAS JOHNSON LOWER SCHOOL PTFA (Working name)
- THOMAS JOHNSON LOWER SCHOOL PTA (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tamra Jane Pickavance | Chair | 15 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Margaret Pepper | Trustee | 15 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.21k | £2.90k | £2.27k | £6.92k | £7.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.24k | £3.78k | £3.59k | £4.56k | £7.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 21 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 19TH JULY 1994 AS AMENDED 13 OCTOBER 2003, AS AMENDED ON 27TH APRIL 2004
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THOMAS JOHNSON LOWER SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
LIDLINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
THOMAS JOHNSON LOWER SCHOOL
HURST GROVE
LIDLINGTON
BEDFORD
MK43 0SB
- Phone:
- 01525402377
- Email:
- TJLSPTFA@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window