PRAVASI MANDAL (ASIAN GROUP)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
- Freshley cooked vegitarian meals - Use of indoor exercise machines - Well being sessions like Yoga, Tai-Chi, keep fit etc. - Workshop & lectures on health related subjects. - Day trips to garden centre, shoppings, religious- historic country parks etc. - Gujarati library, computer use. - Sign postings advise. - Day centre access. - Private hiring of premises when building is not in use.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £18,660 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 08 July 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SURESH M PATEL | Chair | 06 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
DILESH VAGHELA | Trustee | 06 August 2023 |
|
|||||
VINODBHAI MANIBHAI PATEL | Trustee | 06 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Naynesh Mistry | Trustee | 06 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jitendra Majithia | Trustee | 06 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
TEJAS PATEL | Trustee | 24 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
NARENDRABHAI PATEL | Trustee | 22 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.31k | £103.71k | £96.35k | £121.75k | £143.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £84.92k | £76.41k | £67.44k | £79.07k | £97.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.02k | £18.66k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14/06/1996 AS AMENDED ON 22/06/2012 as amended on 06 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THEIR INHABITANTS AND PRIMARILY THE ASIAN INHABITANTS OF NORTHAMPTONSHIRE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR SEXUAL ORIENTATION (OR RACE) OR OF POLITICAL (OR RELIGIOUS) OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIAITNG TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO :- (1) ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE SAID INHABITANTS; AND (11) PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECT. (C) PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Area of benefit
NORTHAMPTONSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
65 Elsden Road
WELLINGBOROUGH
Northamptonshire
NN8 1QD
- Phone:
- 07531797003
- Email:
- pravasimandal2@btconnect.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window