Accounts and annual returns WOOTTON BASSETT INFANTS SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1056601
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 08 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 22 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 01 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 19 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 04 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required