ROCK COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity number: 1056688
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £48.78k £71.23k £34.17k £31.06k £31.17k
Total expenditure £53.95k £60.90k £38.06k £32.28k £29.58k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £5.83k