WOMEN'S IVORY TOWER ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1056703
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

General support for the intergration of the African Francophone community

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023

Total income: £13
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 July 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FEMME TOUR DIVOIRE (Working name)
  • FEMME TOUR D'IVOIRE (Working name)
  • WITA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
YOLANDE BIDI Trustee
None on record
ZEFF ZAH Trustee
None on record
MARIE LAURENCE TAPE PANZO Trustee
None on record
JOYCE JACCA Trustee
None on record
PATRICIA ZUNON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £12 £12 £12 £13 £13
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 19 November 2024 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2022 10 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2021 24 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2020 24 March 2022 175 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 27 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
8b Brunswick Park
Camberwell
London
SE5 7RH
Phone:
02077019007
Website:

No information available