THE TUNSTALL (NORFOLK) CHURCH PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 1056713
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 18 March 2021 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 12 January 2021 342 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 08 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 30 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 27 March 2017 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required