ABERMULE COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1056733
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £27.02k £26.89k £24.38k £22.56k £79.23k
Total expenditure £27.02k £20.83k £17.35k £17.91k £39.15k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A £4.56k N/A
Income from government grants £4.35k £0 £7.00k £7.22k £18.97k