DHARMA FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barnet
- Brent
- Camden
- Enfield
- Haringey
- Islington
Governance
- 12 July 1996: Standard registration
- 27 August 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 7TH MAY 1996
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION ACCORDING TO THE TACHINGS AND TENETS OF HINDUISM.(2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE HINDU LANGUAGE, CULTURE, PHYLOSOPY, ART, LITERATURE, MUSIC AND HISTORY. (3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE TEACHINGS AND TENETS OF HINDUISM IN ORDER TO PROMOTE UNDERSTANDING AND HARMONY AMONGST THE FOLLOWERS OF DIFFERENT RELIGIONS.
Area of benefit
NORTH LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window