11TH SALE (ST JOSEPHS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1056778
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £6.78k £9.56k £13.04k £13.96k £225
Total expenditure £9.25k £7.21k £11.74k £11.09k £8.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A