BRIGHOUSE JUNIORS A.F.C

Charity number: 1056793
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 30 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 30 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 29 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 29 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 27 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 27 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2017 26 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

26 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2016 04 May 2017 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

04 May 2017 34 days late Download