BRIGHOUSE JUNIORS A.F.C

Charity number: 1056793
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £70.00k £74.00k £83.00k £90.00k £95.35k
Total expenditure £62.00k £79.00k £75.00k £100.00k £129.20k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k