ACADEMY FOR CONTEMPORARY CIRCUS AND PHYSICAL THEATRE

Charity number: 1056852
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 07 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 07 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 18 July 2019 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 18 July 2019 18 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 18 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 18 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 09 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

09 March 2017 On time Download