Financial history ACADEMY FOR CONTEMPORARY CIRCUS AND PHYSICAL THEATRE

Charity number: 1056852
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £1.02m £1.17m £1.22m £1.25m £1.31m
Total expenditure £1.02m £1.19m £1.30m £1.17m £1.22m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £153.29k £160.81k £179.16k £249.26k £274.88k
Income - Donations and legacies £10.45k £4.21k £10.77k £0 £15.71k
Income - Other trading activities £174.17k £182.95k £197.60k £83.69k £39.03k
Income - Charitable activities £840.25k £160.81k £179.16k £1.17m £1.26m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £10 £50 £246 £1.08k £1.14k
Income - Other £0 £818.15k £829.57k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £853.70k £1.19m £1.30m £1.17m £1.22m
Expenditure - Raising funds £167.08k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £4.10k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0