ASHBURTON COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1056867
Charity reporting is overdue by 602 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/04/2014 01/04/2015 01/04/2016 01/04/2017 01/04/2018
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £13 £0 £0 £0 £30
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A