Accounts and annual returns THE WORD AND SPIRIT PREVAILING MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1056913
Charity reporting is overdue by 263 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 263 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 263 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 19 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 July 2022 261 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 July 2022 626 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 19 July 2022 992 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required