Financial history THE WORD AND SPIRIT PREVAILING MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1056913
Charity reporting is overdue by 261 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £20.07k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £19.20k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A