LUTTERWORTH AND DISTRICT ROUND TABLE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1056930
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Part of the National Round Table organisation for men aged 18-41. This is a local group based in Lutterworth and surrounding villages. Fundraising activities held annually to include a dog show, bucket collections at supermarkets and others as appropriate.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 03 April 2024

Total income: £7,703
Total expenditure: £6,413

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicestershire
  • Northamptonshire
  • Warwickshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 July 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • LUTTERWORTH ROUND TABLE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SIMON JONES Trustee 19 September 2022
None on record
PAUL JOHNSON Trustee 19 September 2022
None on record
Andrew Vernon Trustee 19 April 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 03/04/2020 03/04/2021 03/04/2022 03/04/2023 03/04/2024
Total gross income £7.04k £1.24k £1.56k £8.14k £7.70k
Total expenditure £6.74k £2.53k £841 £5.20k £6.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 03 April 2024 14 April 2025 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 03 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 03 April 2023 11 April 2024 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 03 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 03 April 2022 11 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 03 April 2021 27 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 03 April 2020 18 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Round Table HQ
Marchesi House
4 Embassy Drive
Edgbaston
BIRMINGHAM
B15 1TP
Phone:
01214564567
Website:

No information available