Accounts and annual returns BRISTOL CATHEDRAL CONCERT CHOIR
Charity number: 1057007
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2015 | 27 October 2015 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2014 | 10 September 2014 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2013 | 11 October 2013 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2012 | 16 September 2012 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2012 | 16 September 2012 | On time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window