ASIAN DIABETIC ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1057109
Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Asian Diabetic Association (ADA)activities are follows: ADA meets once a month at Shrewbury Health Centre, Newham on first monday of the month. ADA provides information on diabeties, diet, foot health and associated health issues. ADA invites professional health speakers to give information on special issues such as eye care, looking after teeth, benefits in Asian languages.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Newham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 July 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ADA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR RASHPAL BHOGAL Trustee
None on record
Dr BABBLAL MANDAVIA Trustee
None on record
GEETA BACHETA Trustee
None on record
Dr PRATAP RAI DUBAL Trustee
None on record
NALINI -NEETA JOSHI Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.50k £10 £10 £0 £0
Total expenditure £200 £10 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 19 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 March 2022 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 March 2021 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
32 ESSEX ROAD
LONDON
E12 6RE
Phone:
02084704828
Website:

No information available