Accounts and annual returns STRATFORD ISLAMIC ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1057171

Charity reporting is overdue by 5 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 5 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 5 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 29 December 2022 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 29 December 2022 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 05 November 2022 | 340 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 05 November 2022 | 340 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 11 March 2021 | 101 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 January 2020
(These accounts |
11 March 2021 | 101 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2019 | 25 July 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2019 | 25 July 2019 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window