Financial history STRATFORD ISLAMIC ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1057171
Charity reporting is overdue by 2 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022
Total gross income £125.47k £71.80k £65.15k £25.66k £48.43k
Total expenditure £30.93k £61.61k £43.99k £37.38k £73.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A