BRITISH WHEELCHAIR BOWLS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aims of the association are:- Integration, Advice, Training, Competition and Coaching. We are here to assist wheelchair users to get the most out of the sport, whether they are just starting out or are experienced bowlers. We help our members to become fully integrated into local clubs playing league matches, club matches and competitions. Several training weekends are run at Stoke Mandeville
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 30 July 1996: Standard registration
- B W B A (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Brown | Chair |
|
|
|||||
PAUL BROWN | Trustee | 21 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
BABS WOOLMORE | Trustee |
|
||||||
KEVIN WOOLMORE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £347 | £0 | £100 | £270 | £120 | |
|
Total expenditure | £721 | £869 | £453 | £3.28k | £10.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 08 June 2020 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 JUNE 1996
Charitable objects
TO RELEIVE THE DISABLED BY PROMOTING AND ENCOURAGING THE GAME OF WHEELCHAIR BOWLS IN GRERAT BRITAIN
Area of benefit
GREAT BRITAIN
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Ger y Mynydd
LANGFORD
Aberdare
Aberdare
Mid Glamorgan
BS40 5EN
- Phone:
- 07801393715
- Email:
- paul.brown@bwba.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window