Financial history WENN EVANS CENTRE

Charity number: 1057260
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.74k £3.52k £3.15k £4.48k £21.57k
Total expenditure £2.40k £2.53k £3.40k £3.80k £3.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £20.47k