Financial history TRUST OF ST JAMES THE GREAT AT ST KEW

Charity number: 1057301
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £2.05k £2.29k £1.17k £1.26k £1.48k
Total expenditure £6.90k £300 £0 £912 £376
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A