UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS DORSET NHS CHARITY

Charity number: 1057366
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.51m £1.64m £1.52m £1.77m £1.39m
Total expenditure £2.03m £3.05m £2.05m £2.23m £1.09m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £966.00k £1.11m £799.04k £765.00k £732.00k
Income - Other trading activities £50.00k £163.42k £0 £760.00k £440.00k
Income - Charitable activities £159.00k £0 £492.26k £0 £0
Income - Endowments £178.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.00k £3.77k £6.63k £4.00k £6.00k
Income - Other £333.00k £369.74k £225.86k £241.00k £208.00k
Income - Legacies £788.00k £860.69k £541.71k £537.00k £485.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.83m £2.70m £1.58m £1.85m £707.00k
Expenditure - Raising funds £204.00k £346.94k £465.99k £380.00k £384.00k
Expenditure - Governance £54.00k £54.57k £55.45k £55.00k £61.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.77m £2.65m £1.53m £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0