ROWDE ACADEMY FRIENDS AND TEACHERS

Charity number: 1057397
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 October 2020 20 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 October 2019 07 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 October 2018 29 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 October 2017 03 September 2018 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 01 October 2016 17 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2016 Not Required