ROWDE ACADEMY FRIENDS AND TEACHERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity raises funds to be used for the benefit of pupils at Rowde Primary Academy. We hold fundraising events such as fetes and discos within the school. The vast majority of the money raised is paid directly to the school to use for the benefit of pupils.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 October 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 06 August 1996: Standard registration
- ROWDE SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucy Scattergood | Chair | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karina Short | Trustee | 08 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Lenert | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Megan Burrough | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emily Rachel Underwood | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Wright | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/10/2019 | 01/10/2020 | 01/10/2021 | 01/10/2022 | 01/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.57k | £1.85k | £3.20k | £3.71k | £2.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.06k | £4.48k | £3.43k | £2.15k | £4.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 October 2023 | 21 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 October 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 October 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 October 2020 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 October 2019 | 07 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09/07/1996 AS AMENDED ON 30/04/2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: A) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; B) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPIS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rowde C of E Primary School
High Street
Rowde
DEVIZES
SN10 2ND
- Phone:
- 01380723991
- Email:
- raftfundraising@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window