EATING DISORDER SUPPORT (PLYMOUTH)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Eating Disorder Support covers geographic areas in Plymouth and part of West Devon. We provide NICE guidelines psychotherapy and specialist dietetic advice for individuals suffering from an eating disorder. We also offer individual/group/ family therapy for clients and carers. EDS provides a 3-day intensive programme for those who are more at risk of deterioration to prevent in-patient admission.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £389,490 from 1 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Devon
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 08 August 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chloe Phillips | Trustee | 03 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Gale | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cathy McCabe | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kirsten Davenport | Trustee | 21 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Reddell-Denton | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicolas McLoughlin | Trustee | 09 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £314.26k | £312.90k | £411.44k | £459.06k | £404.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £307.40k | £305.59k | £362.56k | £351.22k | £407.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £448.01k | £389.49k | |
|
Income from government grants | £312.68k | £312.71k | £410.06k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 April 2024 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 April 2024 | 85 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7 MAY 1996 AS VARIED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 26 JULY 1996
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING EATING DISORDERS. 2) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF EATING DISORDERS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
140
Mt Gould Road
PLYMOUTH
PL4 7PY
- Phone:
- 01752228027
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window