BARMOUTH SAILORS' INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1057490
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £4.42k £4.88k £6.51k £5.60k £17.76k
Total expenditure £2.90k £5.54k £6.19k £5.71k £12.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £10.00k