BARMOUTH SAILORS' INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1057490
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALAN VINCENT Trustee 18 February 2013 None on record
ROSEMARY ANN PERRY Trustee None on record
JANET MARGARET GRIFFITH Trustee None on record
Helen Joan Palmer Trustee 12 February 2018 None on record
Rev BETH BAILEY Trustee 08 February 2016 None on record
Rev Wayne Anthony Hodges Trustee 11 March 2019 None on record
PETER JONES Trustee None on record
JOHN PUDDLE Trustee 01 July 2013 None on record
TREVOR ROBERTS Chair None on record