Accounts and annual returns THE JOHN MORDAUNT TRUST

Charity number: 1057491
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 March 2022 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 March 2022 395 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 19 September 2019 231 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 23 February 2018 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required