Financial history ARCADIANS WOMENS' CLUB

Charity number: 1057503
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/03/2017 01/03/2018 01/03/2019 01/03/2020 01/03/2021
Total gross income £4.97k £4.20k £4.20k £3.11k £0
Total expenditure £4.49k £3.93k £3.93k £3.73k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A