Accounts and annual returns REDBRIDGE CARERS SUPPORT SERVICE

Charity number: 1057505
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 February 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 02 February 2021 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 22 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 21 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 19 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 19 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window