ST OSWALDS' COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1057645
Charity reporting is overdue by 1478 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 Overdue Overdue by 17 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Overdue Overdue by 17 days
Annual return 31 October 2019 Overdue Overdue by 382 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Overdue Overdue by 382 days
Annual return 31 October 2018 Overdue Overdue by 748 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Overdue Overdue by 748 days
Annual return 31 October 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1113 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1113 days
Annual return 31 October 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1478 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1478 days