Financial history SOUTH LIVERPOOL VINEYARD CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1057680
Charity reporting is overdue by 30 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £70.65k £65.69k £98.80k £87.14k £76.96k
Total expenditure £77.65k £67.16k £72.56k £74.51k £58.98k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A