ANDREW CASSELL FOUNDATION (RACING FOR THE DISABLED)

Charity number: 1057742
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Other income £3.31k £1.01k £452 £1.43k £10.28k
Total expenditure £2.97k £1.92k £2.99k £2.08k £14.11k