Trustees ROYAL COLLEGE OF PAEDIATRICS AND CHILD HEALTH
Charity number: 1057744
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanne Mary Shaw | Chair | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Alison Mary Steele | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Taona Christopher Makunganya | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Sunil Singh Bhopal | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|||||||
Simon Christopher Meredith | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Tsitsi Dadirai Chawatama-Kwambana | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Stephen William Turner | Trustee | 31 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Sir Terence John Stephenson | Trustee | 09 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Adam Igra | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Bhanu Williams | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Elizabeth Marder | Trustee | 24 January 2019 |
|
|||||||
Dr John Huw Williams | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.