FAW FOOTBALL IN THE COMMUNITY LIMITED

Charity number: 1057856
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £3.30m £3.71m £3.91m £3.99m £4.14m
Total expenditure £3.24m £3.74m £3.88m £4.03m £3.94m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £716.85k N/A £1.11m
Income - Donations and legacies £2.34m £2.73m £2.73m £2.78m £2.70m
Income - Other trading activities £259.82k £0 £309.94k £1.16m £234.35k
Income - Charitable activities £704.62k £975.33k £856.47k £0 £1.17m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.27k £8.08k £13.95k £0 £14.03k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £41.87k £19.66k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.21m £3.71m £3.84m £3.99m £3.91m
Expenditure - Raising funds £23.45k £25.22k £33.03k £40.65k £26.94k
Expenditure - Governance £66.60k £71.03k £27.05k £0 £80.63k
Expenditure - Grants institution £20.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0